NH SB271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 271 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 271 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.
Title
Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - OTP (Y: 213 N: 140 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - OTP (Y: 213 N: 140 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 271 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/19/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-140 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 32 |
2019-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0873s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0873s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0873s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |