NH SB27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/30/2021; Chapter 0174; Effective 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/30/2021; Chapter 0174; Effective 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of lucky 7 tickets.
Title
Relative to the sale of lucky 7 tickets.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/30/2021; Chapter 0174; Effective 09/28/2021 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1979c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1979c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1979c Filed 06/10/2021; As Amended by Senate |
2021-06-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Pearl Replaces Rep. Doucette 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 22 |
2021-06-11 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Ames Replaces Rep. Almy 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 22 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2021, 12:30 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Doucette, Spilsbury, Almy 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 17 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 17 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, Hennessey, D'Allesandro; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1236h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 34 |
2021-06-04 | House | Amendment # 2021-1236h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 34 |
2021-05-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-05-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1236h (Vote 23-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 30 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91063233087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/04/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92340576130 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97636968924 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0152s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0152s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0152s, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/13/2021, 01:45 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |