NH SB27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Signed by the Governor on 05/12/2017; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Signed by the Governor on 05/12/2017; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to grip height of motorcycles.
Title
Relative to grip height of motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/12/2017; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/11/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 15 |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-04-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 10 |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 03/30/2017 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0008s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0008s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0008s, 01/19/2017; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |