NH SB266 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the limitations on taking another person's lobster or crab trap or pot.
Title
Relative to the limitations on taking another person's lobster or crab trap or pot.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |