NH SB265 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0129; Effective 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0129; Effective 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the aggregation of electric customers by counties.
Title
Relative to the aggregation of electric customers by counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0129; Effective 07/26/2022 |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0155s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0155s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0155s, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |