NH SB265 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - II. Remainder Effective 03/16/2016 Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - II. Remainder Effective 03/16/2016 Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) savings account program.
Title
Establishing the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) savings account program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 03/16/2016 Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | I. Section 3 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 4 Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 03/16/2016; Chapter 0009 Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 03/03/2016); Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled 03/10/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-0519e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 03/03/2016); Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-0519e (Rep. Weyler): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/11/2016 House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Concurs with House Amendments #1222h and #2446h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2446h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 42 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2446h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 42 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2446h for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7-8 |
2015-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-10-07 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:05 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Executive Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-05-13 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-29 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-16 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/23/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 34, PG. 1537 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1222h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1535-1537 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1222h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1535-1537 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1222h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Continued Executive Session: 4/7/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207==RECESSED== |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Hearing: 3/10/15, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |