NH SB265 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2446h for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7-8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) savings account program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) savings account program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2446h for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7-8
2015-10-16HouseExecutive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2015-10-07HouseDivision I Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:05 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212
2015-05-27HouseRetained in Committee
2015-05-20HouseExecutive Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201
2015-05-13HouseDivision I Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212
2015-04-29HouseDivision I Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212
2015-04-16HouseDivision I Work Session: 4/23/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2015-04-15HouseReferred to Finance; House Journal 34, PG. 1537
2015-04-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1222h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1535-1537
2015-04-15HouseAmendment #1222h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1535-1537
2015-04-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1222h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1302
2015-04-01HouseContinued Executive Session: 4/7/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2015-03-24HouseExecutive Session: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207==RECESSED==
2015-03-24HousePublic Hearing: 3/31/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-03-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276
2015-03-19SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9
2015-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13
2015-03-02SenateHearing: 3/10/15, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2015-02-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback