NH SB265 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making a technical correction to the disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues.
Title
Making a technical correction to the disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/11/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/14, Room 103, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |