NH SB265 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2012; Chapter 0132; Effective 08/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2012; Chapter 0132; Effective 08/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of stormwater.
Title
Relative to the definition of stormwater.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2012; Chapter 0132; Effective 08/04/2012 | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2495 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment 1899h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; | |
2012-05-09 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1899h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2235 | |
2012-05-09 | House Amendment #1899h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2235 | |
2012-05-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1899h; House Calendar 36, PG.2027 | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1899h for May 9 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2009 | |
2012-04-24 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-04-06 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/12/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-03-21 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0709s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.124 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Amendment 0709s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.124 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0709s, 2/15/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-03 | Senate Hearing: 1/19/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.6 |