NH SB260 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the public utilities commission to regulate telecommunications service providers.
Title
Relative to the authority of the public utilities commission to regulate telecommunications service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/4/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |