NH SB26 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the electric renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Relative to the electric renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |