NH SB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Signed by the Governor on 09/03/2019; Chapter 337; Effective 09/03/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Signed by the Governor on 09/03/2019; Chapter 337; Effective 09/03/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting foams containing perfluoroalkyl chemicals for use in fighting fires.
Title
Prohibiting foams containing perfluoroalkyl chemicals for use in fighting fires.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 09/03/2019; Chapter 337; Effective 09/03/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1547h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1547h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1547h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0845s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0845s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0845s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |