NH SB253 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB253

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to parental access to a minor child's medical records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to parental access to a minor child's medical records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 34
2023-11-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB253 10/31/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 3
2023-10-12HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 41
2023-08-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-04-26HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-04-25HouseRetained in Committee
2023-04-13HousePublic Hearing: 04/25/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-03-29HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/23/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law
2023-03-23SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
2023-03-23SenateSen. Abbas Moved Ought to Pass; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
2023-03-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-1186s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
2023-03-23SenateSen. Abbas Floor Amendment # 2023-1186s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
2023-03-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14
2023-03-09SenateSpecial Order to 03/23/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2023 Senate Journal 9
2023-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12
2023-02-15SenateHearing: 02/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB253 (Carry Over) 2023-08-30 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback