NH SB253 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Apportioning state senate districts.
Title
Apportioning state senate districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Amendment # 2022-0009s to SB 253 will be proposed and can be accessed via the General Court Website http://gencourt.state.nh.us/Senate/committees/Redistricting/billsandsubmissions.aspx Senate Calendar 1 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |