NH SB252 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to release of a defendant pending trial.
Title
Relative to release of a defendant pending trial.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Mark Proulx [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/23/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Special Order to 03/09/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2023 Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |