NH SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing the age for sales and possession of tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the age for sales and possession of tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-03-07SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-19SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback