NH SB247 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a sunny day fund and grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sunny day fund and grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0990s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0990s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0990s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0648s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0648s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0648s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback