NH SB246 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB246
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of post-arrest photographs under the right to know law.
Title
Relative to disclosure of post-arrest photographs under the right to know law.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12