NH SB245 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Lay SB245 on Table (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted DV 187-148 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Lay SB245 on Table (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted DV 187-148 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study agreements between developers and municipalities on municipal trash removal fees paid by condominium owners and renters.
Title
Establishing a committee to study agreements between developers and municipalities on municipal trash removal fees paid by condominium owners and renters.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] |
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Lay SB245 on Table (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted DV 187-148 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Amendment # 1452h: Amendment Failed DV 140-166 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1452h( New Title) (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1452h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |