NH SB244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to taxes applicable to certain real estate investment trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to taxes applicable to certain real estate investment trusts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-07SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-12SenateHearing: 02/20/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback