NH SB243 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study implementing a state-based health insurance exchange.
Title
Establishing a committee to study implementing a state-based health insurance exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Carry Spier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0664s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0664s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0664s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |