NH SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Signed by the Governor on 05/06/2022; Chapter 0046; Effective 05/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Signed by the Governor on 05/06/2022; Chapter 0046; Effective 05/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Apportioning executive council districts.
Title
Apportioning executive council districts.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Rep. Wayne MacDonald [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - OTP (Y: 174 N: 146 NV: 29 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 145 N: 175 NV: 29 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1189s (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1188s (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 145 N: 175 NV: 29 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1189s (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1188s (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/06/2022; Chapter 0046; Effective 05/06/2022 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/28/2022); Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-29 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-146 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 2022-1543h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 145-175 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1543h Regular Calendar |
2022-04-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 19 |
2022-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/14/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Special Committee on Redistricting |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1188s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment # 2022-1189s, Regular Calendar 9Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2022-1188s, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |