NH SB241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-141 06/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to funding for the project development phase of the capitol corridor rail project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to funding for the project development phase of the capitol corridor rail project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - OTP (Y: 213 N: 141 NV: 8 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-141 06/06/2019
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 19
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-04-30HousePublic Hearing: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0541s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-21SenateSen. Levesque Floor Amendment # 2019-0541s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-28SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1005&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB241
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1041&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1041
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=29&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0241&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB241&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=30&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0241&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB241&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=221&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0241&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB241&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005

Bill Comments

feedback