NH SB241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of transportation and the department of resources and economic development to determine a location for a visitor center in Cheshire county.
Title
Requiring the department of transportation and the department of resources and economic development to determine a location for a visitor center in Cheshire county.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |