NH SB24 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to blanket accident and health insurance.
Title
Relative to blanket accident and health insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |