NH SB239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0127; Effective 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0127; Effective 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to noncompliance with municipal audit requirements.
Title
Relative to noncompliance with municipal audit requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0127; Effective 05/27/2022 |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/20/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |