NH SB238 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prescribing opioids via telehealth medicine.
Title
Relative to prescribing opioids via telehealth medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought To Pass w/ Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 2, 4, 6 & 7 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Sections 2, 4, & 6 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought To Pass w/ Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 2, 4, 6 & 7 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Sections 2, 4, & 6 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 2, 4, 6 & 7 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Sections 2, 4, & 6 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought To Pass w/ Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 2, 4, 6 & 7 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Remainder (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment - Sections 2, 4, & 6 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-18 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1454h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 |
2023-05-18 | House | Amendment # 2023-1454h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1454h (NT) 04/26/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-0588s, 2023-1254s, & 2023-1257s: Remainder of the Bill, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-0588s, 2023-1254s, & 2023-1257s: Sections 2, 4, 6, and 7, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass as Amended: Sections 2, 4, 6, and 7 and then the remainder of the bill; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2023-1257s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-1254s, Remainder of the Floor Amendment, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-1254s, Sections 2, 4, and 6, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on Floor Amendment #2023-1254s, Sections 2, 4, and 6 and then the remainder of the Floor Amendment; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-1254s; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0588s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0588s, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Special Order to 03/30/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/16/2023 Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0588s, 03/16/2023; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Special Order to 03/16/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2023 Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0588s, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0588s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove SB 238 from the Consent Calendar; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Special Order to 03/09/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2023 Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |