NH SB236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the purposes of upgrades to substance use disorder treatment facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the purposes of upgrades to substance use disorder treatment facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1158s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1158s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1158s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0842s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0842s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0842s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback