NH SB236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0118; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0118; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to alcohol ignition interlock requirements.
Title
Relative to alcohol ignition interlock requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0118; Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1583 |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1487 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |