NH SB235 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sexual harassment complaints in the general court and authorizing an independent human resources professional.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sexual harassment complaints in the general court and authorizing an independent human resources professional.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 139 NV: 19 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2601c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2601c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2601c Filed 06/13/2019; Adopt New Amendment
2019-06-19SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 10:30 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Wall, Ley, Wilhelm, Nutting-Wong 06/06/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Wall): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Cavanaugh, Rosenwald; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2191h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-139 06/05/2019
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2191h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2191h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 8-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 18
2019-05-23HouseExecutive Session: 05/23/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-05-07House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 05/21/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-05-07House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-24House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/01/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-19House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/02/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0857s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0857s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0857s, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/20/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback