NH SB235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0256; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0256; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the condominium act and the land sales full disclosure act.
Title
Relative to the condominium act and the land sales full disclosure act.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0256; Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2279c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2279c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2111 |
2015-06-17 | House | Conference Committee Report #2015-2279c; House Amendment; Filed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/17/2015, 11:00 a.m., Room 103, State House |
2015-06-09 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Sterling, Peterson, Carson, Tatro (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-09 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Stiles, and Kelly |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1505h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1505h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1830-1831 |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment #1505h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1830-1831 |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1505h for Jun 3 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1631 |
2015-04-29 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-29 | House | Executive Session: 4/29/2015 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301==RECESSED== |
2015-03-31 | House | ==CANCELLED==Executive Session: 4/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1029s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1029s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1029s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |