NH SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the position of director of the office of outdoor recreation industry development in the department of business and economic affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the position of director of the office of outdoor recreation industry development in the department of business and economic affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Reagan Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0868s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0868s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0868s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/20/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Calendar 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback