NH SB230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the practice of body art.
Title
Relative to the practice of body art.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |