NH SB230 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0178; Effective 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Uniform Power of Attorney Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Uniform Power of Attorney Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0178; Effective 01/01/2018
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-07SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2030e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19
2017-06-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2030e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 148
2017-05-11SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1504h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 30
2017-05-04HouseAmendment #2017-1504h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 30
2017-04-26HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-04-26HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1504h for 05/04/2017 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 10 P. 77
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-0771s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0771s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0771s, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-08SenateHearing: 02/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback