NH SB230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0080; Effective 08/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0080; Effective 08/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to speed limits on state roads that are seasonally congested by pedestrian and bicycle traffic.
Title
Relative to speed limits on state roads that are seasonally congested by pedestrian and bicycle traffic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0080; Effective 08/01/2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1361h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1361h: Motion Adopted DV 252-110; House Journal 36, PG. 1584-1585 |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment #1361h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1584-1585 |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1361h for Apr 29 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1487 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-04-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0334s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0334s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0334s, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |