NH SB23 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0094; Effective 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0094; Effective 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a study committee on meat processing.
Title
Establishing a study committee on meat processing.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Payeur [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Sherry Gould [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0094; Effective 06/20/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/09/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-02 | House | Executive Session: 05/09/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-05-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0031s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0031s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0031s, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |