NH SB229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0274; Effective 09/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0274; Effective 09/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.
Title
Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0274; Effective 09/22/2022 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2099e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2099-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1334h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1334h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1334h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 9 |
2022-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0457s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0457s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0457s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/27/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |