NH SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to multiple-employer welfare arrangements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to multiple-employer welfare arrangements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseConference Committee Report: Not Filed
2019-06-20SenateConferee Change; Senator Feltes Replaces Senator Cavanaugh; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-18HouseConferee Change: Rep. Abel Replaces Rep. Muscatel 06/13/2019
2019-06-19SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:00 am, Room 101, Legislative Office Building
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Williams, Muscatel, Fargo 06/06/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Cavanaugh, Morgan, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2129h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2129h: Amendment Adopted DV 208-144 06/05/2019
2019-05-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2129h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 11
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-0841s, and 2019-1055s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1057s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1055s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0841s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0841s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Calendar 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback