NH SB227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2553h for Jan 6 (Vote 24-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2553h for Jan 6 (Vote 24-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to calculating the cost of an adequate education.
Title
Relative to calculating the cost of an adequate education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2553h for Jan 6 (Vote 24-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7 |
2015-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-09-22 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-08-27 | House | Division II Work Session: 9/1/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-07-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 8/11/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Executive Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-04-30 | House | Division II Work Session: 5/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 36, PG. 1584 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1466h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1584 |
2015-04-29 | House | Floor Amendment #2015-1466h (Reps D. McGuire, L. Ober, Umberger): Amendment Adopted DV 201-161; House Journal 36, PG. 1584 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1487 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0976s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0976s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0976s, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |