NH SB226 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain notice from pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Requiring certain notice from pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/21/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 2 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |