NH SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1673h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1673h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1673h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-04-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1673h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 14
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0590s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0590s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0590s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback