NH SB224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB224
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1158h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1158h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to conversion therapy seeking to change a person's sexual orientation.
Title
Relative to conversion therapy seeking to change a person's sexual orientation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1158h |
2017-11-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/30/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-05-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/28/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/21/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0502s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0502s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0502s, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB224 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1158h