NH SB223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB223
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Title
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Sen. Dietsch Moved Ought to Pass; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 8Y-16N, Motion Failed; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2871s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2871s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2871s, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
Same As/Similar To
SB223 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2871s