NH SB223 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0188; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0188; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to name availability for business organizations.
Title
Relative to name availability for business organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Rep. Raymond Gagnon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0188; Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 314-35; House Journal 44, PG. 1840 |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1634 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |