NH SB221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0146; Effective 06/07/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0146; Effective 06/07/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the internal organization of the department of corrections.
Title
Relative to the internal organization of the department of corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0146; Effective 06/07/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |