NH SB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0087; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0087; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to food safety.
Title
Relative to food safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Michael McCarthy [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0087; Effective 07/01/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 5 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |