NH SB221 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/28/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/28/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to life, accident, and health insurance.
Title
Relative to life, accident, and health insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Flanders [R] | Rep. James Headd [R] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/28/2012 | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2480 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2231 | |
2012-04-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 9 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2007 | |
2012-04-17 | House Executive Session: 4/24/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-03-27 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304 ==Insurance/Consumer Protection Div== | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1447 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass, Div. 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.152 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Sen. Carson having voted on the prevailing side moved to reconsider SB 221, the bill having previously failed Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.152 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass: Div 11Y-11N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 6, Pg.152 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-04 | Senate Hearing: 1/10/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.3 |