NH SB220 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of mental illness for purposes of mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of mental illness for purposes of mental health services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study
2017-03-16SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-23SenateHearing: 03/07/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2017-02-08Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/13/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback