NH SB22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employer immunity for disclosure of certain worker employment information.
Title
Relative to employer immunity for disclosure of certain worker employment information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |