NH SB219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0092; Effective 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0092; Effective 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the disposal of highway or turnpike funded real estate.
Title
Relative to the disposal of highway or turnpike funded real estate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0092; Effective 08/17/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |